Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Doughty, Stephen P, against Ward, Jennifer, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge*JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2021 |
CategoryForeign Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 23, 2022 CORPORATION BUSINESS WITHOUT A REGISTERED AGENT SERVED 09-16-2022 09:15 NEWARK COUNTRY CLUB ACCEPTED BY: KC TRANSACTION ID: 68143004 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 8, 2022 WRIT OF ATTACHMENT FIFA SENT WITH CHECK TO NEW CASTLE COUNTY SHERIFF ON 9-8-2022 ACCEPTED BY: KC TRANSACTION ID: 68050125 WRIT ISSUED |
|
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR: ATTACHMENT FI FA DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 18, 2022 WRIT OF ATTACHMENT FI FA PRAECIPE FOR ATT FI FA ACCEPTED BY: ND TRANSACTION ID: 67940610 ATTACHMENT FIFA |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 23, 2021 CORPORATION OR BUSINESS WITHOUT A REGISTERED AGENT SERVED 09-17-2021 09:51 SOUTHCOW INC ACCEPTED BY: J TRANSACTION ID: 66955467 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 14, 2021 WRIT OF ATTACHMENT FIERI FACIAS ISSUED, WITH CHECK SENT TO NEW CASTLE COUNTY SHERIFF ON 9-14-2021 ACCEPTED BY: KZ TRANSACTION ID: 66925264 WRIT ISSUED |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR: ATTACHMENT FI FA DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 31, 2021 WRIT OF ATTACHMENT PRAECIPE FOR ATT FI FA ACCEPTED BY: MBM TRANSACTION ID: 66889537 ATTACHMENT FIFA |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 20, 2021 FOREIGN JUDGMENT LETTER MAILED TO JENNIFER WARD ON 2-22-2021 ACCEPTED BY: J TRANSACTION ID: 66354333 LETTER |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING FOREIGN JUDGMENTS SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 18, 2021 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: JENNIFER WARD JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT AMOUNT $1038.03 INIT FILING FOREIGN JUDGMENTS |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 18, 2021 FOREIGN JUDGMENT TRANSFER FROM THE STATE OF MARYLAND. JUDGMENT ENTERED IN THE AMOUNT OF $1261.73 (STEPHEN PATRICK DOUGHTY) AFFIDAVIT ACCEPTED BY: MBM TRANSACTION ID: 66346957 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING FOREIGN JUDGMENTS SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 18, 2021 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: **ODP_CDIDOCA_ASSOC_PERSONS JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: **DE_GENERAL_JUDG_ASSESSMENTS INIT FILING FOREIGN JUDGMENTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.