Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Doughty, Stephen P, against Kamarek, Ryan, Kazmarek, Ryan, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge*JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2021 |
CategoryForeign Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE SPOKE WITH WAYNE PARSONS AT LYONS DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS, PA AND ADVISED EXEMPLIFIED COPY WILL BE MAILED ON 07-07-2022 DATE DOCKETED: JULY 6, 2022 NOTICE |
|
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER FOR COPY OF EXEMPLIFIED JUDGMENT DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 17, 2022 EXEMPLIFIED COPY REQUEST ACCEPTED BY: ND TRANSACTION ID: 67731490 MISC-EXEMPLIFIED JUDGMENT |
|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 CORPORATION OR BUSINESS WITHOUT A REGISTERED AGENT SERVED 09-15-2021 14:05 AIR TEMP SOLUTIONS LLC ACCEPTED BY: J TRANSACTION ID: 66938102 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 14, 2021 WRIT OF ATTACHMENT FIFA ISSUED WITH CHECK SENT TO NEW CASTLE COUNTY SHERIFF ON 9-14-2021 ACCEPTED BY: J TRANSACTION ID: 66925279 WRIT ISSUED |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR: ATTACHMENT FI FA DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 1, 2021 WRIT OF ATTACHMENT FI FA PRAECIPE FOR ATT FI FA ACCEPTED BY: MBM TRANSACTION ID: 66892968 ATTACHMENT FIFA |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 20, 2021 FOREIGN JUDGMENT LETTER MAILED TO RYAN KAZMAREK AKA RYAN KAMAREK ON 2-22-2021 ACCEPTED BY: J TRANSACTION ID: 66354209 LETTER |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 18, 2021 FOREIGN JUDGMENT TRANSFER FROM THE STATE OF MARYLAND. JUDGMENT ENTERED IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 4791.60 (STEPHEN PATRICK DOUGHTY) AFFIDAVIT ACCEPTED BY: MBM TRANSACTION ID: 66346909 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING FOREIGN JUDGMENTS SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 18, 2021 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED JOINT AND SEVERAL AGAINST: RYAN KAZMAREK RYAN KAMAREK JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT AMOUNT $3877.97 INIT FILING FOREIGN JUDGMENTS |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING FOREIGN JUDGMENTS SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 18, 2021 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: **ODP_CDIDOCA_ASSOC_PERSONS JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: **DE_GENERAL_JUDG_ASSESSMENTS INIT FILING FOREIGN JUDGMENTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.