Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gorman, John, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ramunno, L. Vincent, against Chrisler, Elizabeth M., in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with 004418 presiding.
Case Number |
Judge004418 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: MAY 13, 2022 STIPULATION & ORDER OF DISMISSAL ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 67612424 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
COURT DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: MAY 13, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY: BRENNAN, DANIELLE SO ORDERED (STIPULATION & ORDER OF DISMISSAL) ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 67613137 COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
SO NOTED DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 13, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY: BRENNAN, DANIELLE SO NOTED (LETTER TO THE COURT FROM BRAIN MCNELIS RE CASE HAS SETTLED AT MEDIATION WITH YVONNE SAVILLE AND WILL NOT BE PROCEEDING TO TRIAL ON FEBRUARY 15, 2023.) ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 67472390 SO NOTED |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
CASE SETTLED DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 8, 2022 CASE SETTLED |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 13, 2022 LETTER TO THE COURT FROM BRAIN MCNELIS RE CASE HAS SETTLED AT MEDIATION WITH YVONNE SAVILLE AND WILL NOT BE PROCEEDING TO TRIAL ON FEBRUARY 15, 2023. ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 67465210 LETTER FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 9, 2022 THIS LETTER IS A CONFIRMATION THAT THE COURT HAS BEEN NOTIFIED BY THE PLAINTIFF OR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IN THE ABOVE REFERENCE CASE THAT THE PARTIES HAVE SETTLED THIS MATTER AS TO ALL CLAIMS AND ALL PARTIES. IN ORDER FOR THE COURT TO CLOSE ITS FILE , A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL MUST BE FILED. IF A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OR A LETTER STATING THE STATUS OF THIS MATTER, IS NOT FILED WITH THE COURT WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS LETTER, THE COURT WILL DISMISS THIS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 67462538 LETTER |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
E-MAIL FILED DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 9, 2022 EMAIL FROM YVONNE SAVILLE CONFIRMING THAT THE CASE HAS SETTLED. ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 67462518 E-MAIL FILED |
|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
ADR - SCHEDULE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 8, 2022 RESCHEDULING LETTER FROM MEDIATOR SETTING HEARING DATE FOR FRIDAY, APRIL 8, 2022 AT 8:00 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 67366482 ADR CODES (CONVERSION ONLY) |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
VACATION OF DEPOSITION DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 18, 2022 VACATION OF DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF JOHN GORMAN BY BRIAN MCNELIS SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 2, 2022, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ATTACHED. ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 67323154 VACATION OF DEPOSITION |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
RE-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 10, 2022 RENOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF JOHN GORMAN TO BE HELD ON WEDNESDAY, MARCH 2, 2022 AT 1:00 P.M. WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ATTACHED. ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 67301946 RE-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.