Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Diaz, Jesus E, filed a(n) Petition Return Of Property case against State Of Delaware, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, DE, . Kent County, DE Superior Courts with FREUD, ANDREA M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFREUD, ANDREA M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 01, 2021 |
CategoryPetition Return Of Property |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, DE |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JULY 1, 2022 NOTICE OF ROP HEARING ON 9-20-22 @ 2PM. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67779236 LETTER |
|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: JULY 1, 2022 ROP NOTICE FOR 9-20-22 MAILED TO PETITIONER ON 6-30-22 AT ADDRESS LISTED ON PETITION. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67779284 NOTICE |
|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 30, 2022 LETTER FROM STATE TO ADVISE CRIMINAL MATTER RESOLVED-STAY MAY BE LIFTED TO PROCEED ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67776722 LETTER |
|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION REMOVED FROM CALENDAR TRIAL DATE STILL PENDING DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 25, 2022 MOTION REMOVED FROM CALENDAR |
|
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 3, 2022 LETTER TO PARTIES RE: CALL OF CALENDAR-ROP SCHEDULED FOR TUESDAY, APRIL 26TH, 2022 AT 2 P.M. (LIVE) ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67360232 LETTER |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 23, 2022 LETTER FROM DOJ TO THE COURT REQUESTING THE CASE BE STAYED PENDING THE RESOLUTION OF THE CRIMINAL MATTER. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67335927 LETTER |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 23, 2021 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66952399 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: JULY 28, 2021 ORDER SIGNED BY: FREUD, ANDREA MAYBEE ORDER - STAYED UNTIL RESOLUTION OF THE UNDERLYING CRIMINAL MATTERS ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66802296 ORDER |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JULY 28, 2021 UPCOMING ASSET FORFEITURE MATTERS K21M-03-008 JESUS DIAZ ORDER ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66800931 LETTER |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 8, 2021 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES - STATE OF DELAWARE'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION DIRECTED TO JESUS DIAZ ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66658641 NOTICE SRV OF INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.