Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Delaware Division Of Revenue, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Cooksey, Michael B, against Mckee, William, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, DE, . Kent County, DE Superior Courts with GREEN-STREETT, RENETA L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGREEN-STREETT, RENETA L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 06, 2022 |
CategoryDivision Of Revenue Judgment |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationKent County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
GARNISHMENT ISSUED TO EMPLOYER (DOR) DATE DOCKETED: JULY 8, 2022 GARNISHMENT - WILLIAM MCKEE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67798756 GARNISHMENT ISSUED EMPLOYER |
|
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
GARNISHMENT ISSUED TO EMPLOYER (DOR) DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 7, 2022 GARNISHMENT - WILLIAM MCKEE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67456084 GARNISHMENT ISSUED EMPLOYER |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING DIVISION OF REVENUE (DOR) SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 27, 2021 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: WILLIAM MCKEE JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: TAX $694.00 PENALTY $20.82 INTEREST $127.36 PLUS ALL OTHER COSTS ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ACTION INIT FILING DIV OF REVENUE |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 27, 2021 DIVISION OF REVENUE JUDGMENT ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66457949 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING DIVISION OF REVENUE (DOR) SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 27, 2021 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: **ODP_CDIDOCA_ASSOC_PERSONS JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: **DE_GENERAL_JUDG_ASSESSMENTS INIT FILING DIV OF REVENUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.