Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Delaware Division Of Revenue, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Cooksey, Michael B, against Johnson Iii, Joseph M, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, DE, . Kent County, DE Superior Courts with 000648 presiding.
Case Number |
Judge000648 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 25, 2022 |
CategoryDivision Of Revenue Judgment |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationKent County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
GARNISHMENT ISSUED TO EMPLOYER (DOR) DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 26, 2022 GARNISHMENT- JOSEPH M JOHNSON III ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67503293 GARNISHMENT ISSUED EMPLOYER |
|
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
GARNISHMENT ISSUED TO EMPLOYER (DOR) DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 29, 2022 GARNISHMENT-JOSEPH M JOHNSON III ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67272303 GARNISHMENT ISSUED EMPLOYER |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 26, 2021 DIVISION OF REVENUE JUDGMENT ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66454051 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING DIVISION OF REVENUE (DOR) SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 26, 2021 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: JOSEPH M JOHNSON JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: TAX $620.00 PENALTY $130.20 INTEREST $31.67 PLUS ALL OTHER COSTS ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ACTION INIT FILING DIV OF REVENUE |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING DIVISION OF REVENUE (DOR) SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 26, 2021 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: **ODP_CDIDOCA_ASSOC_PERSONS JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: **DE_GENERAL_JUDG_ASSESSMENTS INIT FILING DIV OF REVENUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.