Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Delaware Division Of Revenue, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Cooksey, Michael B, against Cimo, Amanda R, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, DE, . Kent County, DE Superior Courts with 000648 presiding.
Case Number |
Judge000648 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2022 |
CategoryDivision Of Revenue Judgment |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationKent County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT: SATISFIED DATE DOCKETED: JULY 6, 2022 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67789484 JUDGMENT: SATISFIED |
|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
GARNISHMENT ISSUED TO EMPLOYER (DOR) DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 3, 2022 GARNISHMENT - AMANDA R CIMO ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67283776 GARNISHMENT ISSUED EMPLOYER |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 4, 2021 DIVISION OF REVENUE JUDGMENT ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66386919 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING DIVISION OF REVENUE (DOR) SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 4, 2021 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: AMANDA R CIMO JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: TAX $514.00 PENALTY $35.98 INTEREST $18.81 PLUS ALL OTHER COSTS ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ACTION INIT FILING DIV OF REVENUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.