Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Morse Home Improvement, Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Junge, Gary E, Demott, Brian V, against Coverdale, Karen, Coverdale, Greg, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, DE, . Kent County, DE Superior Courts with PRIMOS, NOEL EASON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePRIMOS, NOEL EASON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2022 |
CategoryDebt / Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKent County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 11, 2022 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL SIGNED BY JUDGE PRIMOS ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67220693 ORDER |
|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 8, 2022 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67215317 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
TRIAL SCHEDULED: SETTLED PRIOR TO TRIAL DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 11, 2022 TRL SCHD: SETTLED PRIOR TRIAL |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER DATE DOCKETED: MAY 1, 2021 SCHEDULING ORDER ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66561325 SCHEDULING ORDER |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 31, 2021 LETTER TO COUNSEL RE: TELECONFERENCE TO ESTABLISH A SCHEDULING ORDER ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66468395 LETTER |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING DEBT / BREACH OF CONTRACT DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 26, 2021 INIT FILING DEBT/BREACH CONT |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 26, 2021 TRANSCRIPT FROM CCP ON CASE CPU5-21-000106 ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66453511 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.