Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Booz, Christina, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Junge, Gary E, against Thornton, Joseph J., Advanced Plastic Surgery Center, A Delaware Professional Ass, Advanced Plastic Surgery Center, A Delaware Limited Partners, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, DE, . Kent County, DE Superior Courts with PRIMOS, NOEL EASON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePRIMOS, NOEL EASON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKent County, DE |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 15, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY: PRIMOS, NOEL EASON SO ORDERED (STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE) ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67479549 ORDER |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 13, 2022 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67472300 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
TRIAL SCHEDULED: SETTLED PRIOR TO TRIAL DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 11, 2022 TRL SCHD: SETTLED PRIOR TRIAL |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 12, 2022 CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67386576 CONFIRMATION DISMISSAL LETTER |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
ADR - SCHEDULE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 23, 2022 INITIAL AND SCHEDULING LETTER FROM MEDIATOR SETTING HEARING DATE FOR THURSDAY, MARCH 10, 2022 AT 4:00 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67335570 ADR CODES (CONVERSION ONLY) |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 29, 2021 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT, JOSEPH J. THORNTON AND PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT, JOSEPH J. THORNTON ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67052456 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: JULY 24, 2021 NOTICE OF RECORDS ONLY DEPOSITION OF CAMDEN WALK-IN FOR SEPTEMBER 7, 2021 AT 10:00 A.M. AT THE OFFICES OF MARSHALL DENNEHEY WARNER COLEMAN & GOGGIN CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF RECORDS ONLY DEPOSITION ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66794528 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: JULY 2, 2021 NOTICE OF SERVICE TO PLAINTIFF AMENDED ANSWER TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFF SPECIFICALLY INTERROGATORY NO. 5C ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66732407 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: JULY 2, 2021 NOTICE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66729858 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 10, 2021 SCHEDULING ORDER ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66667598 SCHEDULING ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.