Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Thomas, Brooke, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hayes, Theresa M, against Caldwell, Ashley, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, DE, . Kent County, DE Superior Courts with WITHAM JR., WILLIAM L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWITHAM JR., WILLIAM L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKent County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 4, 2022 LETTER FROM EDWARD GILL, ESQUIRE DATED AUGUST 3, 2022 CASE SETTLED ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67897724 LETTER |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 7, 2022 NOTICE OF SERVICE TO ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES, VERIFICATION OF ASHLEY CALDWELL, DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND EXHIBIT A ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67692837 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 30, 2022 NOTICE OF SERVICE TO DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67519898 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 15, 2022 RE-NOTICE OF RECORDS ONLY DEPOSITION OF DR. DAVID EAKIN SCHEDULED FOR MAY 6TH 2022 AT 10:00 A.M. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67479462 NOTICE |
|
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 15, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY: GREEN-STREETT, RENETA L SO ORDERED (STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER AMENDING TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER) ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67478191 ORDER |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 14, 2022 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER AMENDING TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67473763 STIPULATION |
|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 25, 2022 NOTICE OF RECORDS ONLY DEPOSITION OF DR. DAVID EAKIN SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 13TH 2022 AT 9:00 A.M. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67423165 NOTICE |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 9, 2022 ORDER [STIPULATION TO AMEND TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER] SIGNED BY JUDGE RENETA L. GREEN-STREETT ON 3-8-2022. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67374201 ORDER |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 8, 2022 STIPULATION TO AMEND TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67371615 STIPULATION |
|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
RE-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF: DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 7, 2022 RENOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF BROOKE THOMAS ON JANUARY 13, 2022 AT 1:00 P.M. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67214175 RE-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.