Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
White, Mardella, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Collins Ii, Robert C, against Purse, Howard, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, DE, . Kent County, DE Superior Courts with GREEN-STREETT, RENETA L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGREEN-STREETT, RENETA L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 01, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKent County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
TRIAL SCHEDULED: SETTLED PRIOR TO TRIAL DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 1, 2022 TRL SCHD: SETTLED PRIOR TRIAL |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 9, 2021 ORDER [STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL] SIGNED BY JUDGE RENETA L. GREEN-STREETT ON 12-3-2021. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67150872 ORDER |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 7, 2021 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AS TO ALL PARTIES WITH PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67144518 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 16, 2021 ORDER 0 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL, GRANTED ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66933553 ORDER |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION GRANTED DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 15, 2021 MOTION GRANTED |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 26, 2021 NOTICE OF HEARING TO MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S MEDICAL AUTHORIZATION ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66879444 NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL SCHEDULED FOR: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 26, 2021 MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S MEDICAL AUTHORIZATION WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ATTACHED PROPOSED ORDER TO THE MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S MEDICAL AUTHORIZATION EXHIBIT A TO THE MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S MEDICAL AUTHORIZATION ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66877918 MOTION TO COMPEL |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 18, 2021 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF ASHLEY M. CALLAWAY ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT HOWARD PURSE WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ATTACHED ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66855123 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 18, 2021 SCHEDULING ORDER ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66854892 SCHEDULING ORDER |
|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 14, 2021 LETTER CONFIRMING SCHEDULING TELECONFERENCE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66849037 LETTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.