Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Megna, Judith A, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Fletcher Jr., William D, against Outback Steakhouse Of Florida Llc, A Foreign Entity, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, DE, . Kent County, DE Superior Courts with 003124 presiding.
Case Number |
Judge003124 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 02, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKent County, DE |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 29, 2022 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PL'S SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWERS TO SET I INTERROGS AND SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO RULE 9G ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67773045 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 25, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY: PRIMOS, NOEL EASON SO ORDERED (STIPULATION TO AMEND CASE SCHEDULING ORDER AS TO DISCOVERY AND ADR COMPLETION DATES) ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67761907 ORDER |
|
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 22, 2022 STIPULATION TO AMEND CASE SCHEDULING ORDER AS TO DISCOVERY AND ADR COMPLETION DATES ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67746152 STIPULATION |
|
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 23, 2022 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF ON TUESDAY, AUGUST 16, 2022 BEGINNING AT 2 P.M. IN THE OFFICE OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, SCHMITTINGER & RODRIGUEZ CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67746351 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 16, 2021 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PL'S SUPPLEMENTAL DISC OF MEDICAL EXPERT ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67093694 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 PL'S SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY REGARDING EXPERT COHEN EXHIBIT A - EXPERT COHEN REPORT & CV NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISC EXPERT ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66937864 DISCOVERY |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 9, 2021 SCHEDULING ORDER; PTC 11-10-22, TCC 12-9-22, 3 DAY TRIAL 12-12-2022 ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66913019 SCHEDULING ORDER |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 11, 2021 LETTER CONFIRMING TELE-SCHEDULE TO OBTAIN A TRIAL DATE SEPTEMBER 8 2021 AT 11:15 AM ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66835399 LETTER |
|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: JULY 15, 2021 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S ANSWERS AND RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66764843 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: MAY 22, 2021 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S RULE 9(G) REQUEST ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66619162 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.