Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Del-One Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Savage, Lori E, against Huttie, Alexis, Huttie, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, DE, . Kent County, DE Superior Courts with GREEN-STREETT, RENETA L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGREEN-STREETT, RENETA L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 02, 2021 |
CategoryDebt / Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKent County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION OF JUDGMENT DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 25, 2021 STIPULATION OF JUDGMENT ACCEPTED BY: 1 TRANSACTION ID: 66449517 STIPULATION OF JUDGMENT |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 5, 2021 SUBSTITUTE SERVED 03-03-2021 10:00 MICHAEL HUTTIE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66391162 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 5, 2021 PERSONAL SERVED 03-03-2021 10:00 ALEXIS HUTTIE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66391140 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 3, 2021 ORDER SIGNED BY: WITHAM, WILLIAM L WRITS SIGNED AND COURT SEAL APPLIED. SENT TO KENT COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE FOR SERVICE ON MICHAEL HUTTIE & ALEXIS HUTTIE. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66382193 WRIT ISSUED |
|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 24, 2021 COMPLAINT CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT PRAECIPE SUMMONS EXHIBIT A EXHIBIT B ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66362044 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING DEBT / BREACH OF CONTRACT DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 24, 2021 INIT FILING DEBT/BREACH CONT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.