Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Delano Gardens Housing Partners, Lp, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Evans, Chris J, against Miller, Michael, Miller, Sandra, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Pulskamp, Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePulskamp, Gregory Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2018 |
Category32-Cl <10K Unlawful Detainer - Residential - Civil Limited |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal
Date: July 24, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2020 | Hearing |
Order Dismissing Action (Full)
Judge: Tafoya, Robert S. |
|
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 07/24/2020 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal Judge: Palmer - Retired, William D. |
|
June 03, 2020 | Hearing |
Notice of Order to Appear mailed to all parties |
|
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Order to Appear mailed to all parties |
|
February 22, 2019 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c)
Judge: Tafoya, Robert S. |
|
January 25, 2019 | Hearing | Electronic Rejection Notice | |
January 09, 2019 | Hearing |
Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)
Judge: Benavides, Jose R. |
|
December 19, 2018 | Hearing |
Notice of Trial mailed to both parties |
|
December 19, 2018 | Hearing | Request/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD) | |
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Trial mailed to both parties |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.