Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gerardo Gutierrez Mosqueda, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Abigail Moncerrath Gutierrez, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with JoAnn Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoAnn Johnson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management180 days |
Filing DateNovember 01, 2018 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions53 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2039 | Docket Event | ** DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED 03/14/19 ** | |
April 28, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF JUDGMENT AND ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED BY GERARDO GUTIERREZ MOSQUEDA - ORDERED BY JUDICIAL OFFICER JOANN JOHNSON | |
December 24, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
December 24, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION (FAMILY CODE 2336) FILED | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | JURISDICTION DATE: 11/01/18 | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED BY GERARDO GUTIERREZ MOSQUEDA | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON PETITION OF MOSQUEDA AS TO ABIGAIL MONCERRATH GUTIERREZ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.