Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Agustina Jaramillo, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Rene Zaragoza, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with JoAnn Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoAnn Johnson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 03, 2018 |
CategoryDv Req Orders |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2039 | Docket Event | MEDIATOR: EUCIANE SOUZA ON 07/26/18 | |
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event | CONSENT FOR COURT ASSIGNMENT TO COMMISSIONER WILLIAM REDMOND FILED BY RENE ZARAGOZA | |
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event | HEARING ON REQUEST FOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDER FILED BY AGUSTINA JARAMILLO FILED ON 07/03/18 | |
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event | HEARING ON REQUEST FOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDER FILED BY AGUSTINA JARAMILLO FILED ON 07/03/18 | |
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER ON REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING (TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER) (CLETS-TRO) FILED BY AGUSTINA JARAMILLO - GRANTED | |
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event | MEDIATION SET IN VENTURA | |
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event | AGREEMENT AND ORDER RE: CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED | |
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ORDER SERVED ON AGUSTINA JARAMILLO FILED - DATE OF MAILING 07/19/18 | |
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDER FILED BY RENE ZARAGOZA, REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER | |
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event | CONSENT FOR COURT ASSIGNMENT TO COMMISSIONER JOANN JOHNSON FILED BY AGUSTINA JARAMILLO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.