Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Matthew S Troyer, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Tamara Lee Paul Troyer, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with JoAnn Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoAnn Johnson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management182 days |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions444 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2039 | Docket Event | MEDIATOR: AMY SMITH ON 10/20/14 | |
July 19, 2016 | Docket Event | FINDINGS AND ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED | |
July 19, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDERS (POST JUDGMENT) RE: MODIFICATION - CHILD SUPPORT FILED BY TAMARA LEE PAUL TROYER FILED ON 06/15/16 | |
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF RESPONSIVE DECL TO RFO SERVED ON TAMARA LEE PAUL TROYER FILED. DATE OF MAILING 06/28/16 | |
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event | RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO REQUEST FOR ORDERS SET FOR 07/19/16 FILED BY MATTHEW S TROYER | |
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY MATTHEW S TROYER | |
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY TAMARA LEE PAUL TROYER | |
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDERS (POST JUDGMENT) RE: MODIFICATION - CHILD SUPPORT FILED BY TAMARA LEE PAUL TROYER FILED ON 06/15/16 | |
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event | FEE PAID BY TAMARA LEE PAUL TROYER (REQUEST FOR ORDER, MOTION OR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN A FAMILY LAW MATTER) | |
March 02, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATED QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER RE: UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA DEFINED CONTRIBUTION AND TAX DEFERRED ANNUITY PLANS FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.