Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cynthia R Morales, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Juan P Morales, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with JoAnn Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoAnn Johnson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management182 days |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions66 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time182 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2014 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION (FAMILY CODE 2336) FILED | |
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event | MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 07/21/14 | |
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON PETITION OF MORALES AS TO JUAN P MORALES | |
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY CYNTHIA R MORALES | |
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED BY CYNTHIA R MORALES | |
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND PETITION OF MORALES SERVED ON JUAN P MORALES WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/20/14 FILED | |
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event | JURISDICTION DATE: 01/20/14 | |
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY CYNTHIA R MORALES (PETITION OR OTHER FIRST PAPER, INCLUDING A JOINT PETITION, FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE OR DOMESTIC PARTNERSHIP, LEGAL SEPARATION OR NULLITY) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.