Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Nicolas Robles, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Sandra Lopez Robles, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with JoAnn Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoAnn Johnson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management185 days |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2013 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions468 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time683 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
May 13, 2015 | Docket Event | FEE PAID BY SANDRA LOPEZ ROBLES (STIP AND ORDER NOT REQUIRING A HEARING; REQUEST OR STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OFHEARING OR CMC NOT REQUIRING A HEARING - FAMILY LAW) | |
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW COURT TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 0 DAYS 1:50 HOURS. | |
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED | |
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event | MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 04/09/15 | |
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION (FAMILY CODE 2336) FILED | |
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE, STIPULATION AND WAIVERS (RESPONSE ALREADY FILED) FILED BY SANDRA LOPEZ ROBLES | |
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event | FEE PAID BY SANDRA LOPEZ ROBLES (STIP AND ORDER NOT REQUIRING A HEARING; REQUEST OR STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OFHEARING OR CMC NOT REQUIRING A HEARING - FAMILY LAW) | |
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.