Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Dinora L. Zepeda, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Francisco J. Gonzalez, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryPetition |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ORDER RELIEVING DISTRICT ATTY ETC, SERVED ON DINORA L ZEPEDA, FRANCISCO J ETC, (NON-PARTY) FILED. DATE OF MAILING: 01/27/11 | |
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event | FINDINGS AND ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED | |
January 20, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF OSC FLD 1-18-11; ORD RELIEVING DA ATTY CHILD ABDUCTION AND RECOVERY UNIT SERVED ON FRANCISCO J GONZALEZ FILED. DATE OF MAILING 01/19/11. | |
January 20, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED | |
January 18, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER RELIEIVING DISTRICT ATTORNEY CHILD ABDUCTION RECOVERY UNIT OF APPOINTMENT FILED | |
January 18, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED BY DINORA L ZEPEDA FILED ON 09/15/10 | |
January 18, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF OSC FILED 09/15/10, TEMP ORDERS, APP FOR; ETC SERVED ON FRANCISCO J GONZALEZ FILED. DATE OF MAILING 12/23/10 | |
January 11, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED BY DINORA L ZEPEDA FILED ON 09/15/10 | |
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event | FAX REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE AND ORDER FILED | |
December 07, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED BY DINORA L ZEPEDA FILED ON 09/15/10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.