Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kimberly A Damato, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Michael Garcia, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Rocky J. Baio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRocky J. Baio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryDv Req Orders |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time1866 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 34 DUE TO JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT | |
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 36 DUE TO JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT | |
November 22, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING (CLETS) SERVED ON MICHAEL GARCIA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/26/10. COPY FORWARDED TO SHERIFF FOR ENTRY IN CLETS | |
January 25, 2010 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO APPOINT ROCKY BAIO AS JUDGE PRO TEM SIGNED AND FILED | |
January 25, 2010 | Docket Event | RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING (CLETS) FILED. RESTRAINING ORDER EXPIRES 01/24/15 | |
January 25, 2010 | Docket Event | HEARING ON RESTRAINING ORDER REQUESTED BY KIMBERLY A DAMATO | |
January 06, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF DV REQ ORDERS OF DAMATO SERVED ON MICHAEL GARCIA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/31/09 FILED | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY KIMBERLY A DAMATO | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: EX PARTE NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY KIMBERLY A DAMATO | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 34 (FAMILY LAW) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.