Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of Ventura filed a(n) Complaint case against Shellaree Holecek, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryComplaint |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time3411 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE REGARDING PAYMENT OF SUPPORT (LOCAL CHILD SUPPORT AGENCY NO LONGER PROVIDING SERVICES) FILED | |
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 34 DUE TO JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT | |
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 36 DUE TO JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT | |
May 24, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED (JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 05/21/10) | |
May 24, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO SHELLAREE HOLECEK | |
May 24, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO STEVE R BUTTER | |
May 21, 2010 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ESTABLISHING PARENTAL RELATIONSHIP AND CHILD SUPPORT FILED | |
May 21, 2010 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED | |
May 17, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF BUTTER AS TO SHELLAREE HOLECEK. | |
April 30, 2010 | Docket Event | JURISDICTION DATE: 02/17/10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.