Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
County Of Ventura filed a(n) 1St Amended Complaint case against Eric James Rodriguez, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
Category1St Amended Complaint |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions10958 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2039 | Docket Event | ** CASE DISMISSED 02/10/12 ** | |
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 34 DUE TO JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT | |
February 10, 2012 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED | |
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 36 DUE TO JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT | |
October 12, 2011 | Docket Event | AMENDED FIRST FILED | |
December 30, 2009 | Docket Event | DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED | |
December 30, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 34 (FAMILY LAW) | |
December 30, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY - ORIGINAL RETAINED IN COURT FILE | |
December 30, 2009 | Docket Event | DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES # 200000000503011 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.