Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
A-L Financial Coporation, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Husein, Shady A, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErrea, Larry A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2015 |
CategorySmall Claims - More Than 12 Claims Within 12 Months |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Cycle Time888 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2017 | Hearing |
Writ Returned Wholly Satisfied Kern County |
|
July 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned Wholly Satisfied Kern County |
|
June 16, 2017 | Hearing | Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction | |
June 02, 2015 | Hearing | Writ of Execution Issued | |
June 02, 2015 | Hearing | Memorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed | |
April 08, 2015 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties Document Image |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties Document Image |
|
April 01, 2015 | Hearing |
NP1500 Department: AD Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: CARLA RUBALCAVA, COLLECTOR APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR A-L FINANCIAL CORPORATION (PL-1) . SHADY A HUSEIN (DE-1) APPEARS WITH IN PRO PER - PERSON. CARLA RUBALCAVA DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF. DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFF. JUDGMENT FOR A-L FINANCIAL (PL-1) AGAINST SHADY A. HUSEIN (DE-1) FOR PRINCIPAL $2500.00 COSTS $151.00 . THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, AFTER EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY). ELECTRONIC RECORDING NUMBER(S):1345 . |
|
April 01, 2015 | Hearing |
4150 Small Claims Trial Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: Claim: $2500 Cost:$101.00 ($50 Filing fee + 51 Service fee) Proof of service filed. |
|
April 01, 2015 | Hearing |
Small Claims Trial Claim: $2500 Cost:$101.00 ($50 Filing fee + 51 Service fee) Proof of service filed. Judge: Errea, Larry A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.