Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Arellano, Karina M, filed a(n) (43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) (Vs) (Cvpt) case against Avalos, Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2022 |
Category(43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) (Vs) (Cvpt) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Order
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Order
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | CH - Order on Request to Continue Hearing | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | CH - Request to Continue Court Hearing | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Re Civil Harassment Filing Fees | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte on Court's Own Motion
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.