Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Rojo, Summar, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gimblin, Steve, against Ellison, Krystal Lynn, represented by Shaft, Cassandra D, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2022 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Party Appeared by Audio and/or Video | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
OSC For Failure To Appear
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.