Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Espinosa, Tristan, against Parker, Daniel Richard, represented by Leach & Mcgreevy Llp, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 29, 2022 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedMarch 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Party Appeared by Audio and/or Video | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Appearance | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Regarding Remote Appearance | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.