Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Little, Toby filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Timothy J. Evans presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy J. Evans Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryConservatorship (Prpc) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Annual Review Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
July 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Conservatorship Hearing on Annual Review | |
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Annual Review Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Conservatorship Six Month Review | |
September 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Annual G'Ship or C'Ship Review Hearing | |
May 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Conservatorship Hearing on Annual Review | |
May 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Annual Review Hearing
Judge: Jacques, Michael A |
|
May 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.