Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yuba County, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Yuba County, against Casey, Dana William, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with James L. Curry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames L. Curry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
March 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Governmental - Order After Hearing | |
March 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Contempt Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
February 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
February 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
February 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Governmental - Stipulation and Order | |
December 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
December 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Unspecified |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.