Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 05, 1995 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Governmental - Order After Hearing | |
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice Returning Docs Annex | |
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Governmental - Response to Notice Motion/Order to Show Cause | |
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Gov - Notice of Motion | |
May 11, 2006 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
May 11, 2006 | Docket Event | Unspecified |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.