Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case in the jurisdiction of Shasta County. This case was filed in Shasta County Superior Courts with Berglund, John R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBerglund, John R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2022 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationShasta County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2025 | Hearing |
Control Date
Judge: Berglund, John R |
|
July 25, 2022 | Hearing |
*Trial: Court
Judge: Berglund, John R |
|
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Letter Received | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Letter Received | |
April 25, 2022 | Hearing |
*Trial: Court
Judge: Berglund, John R |
|
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Granting Fee Waiver for Petitioner/Plaintiff | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Assigned Judge to Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.