Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Case, Claudia Yvette, against Acevedo, Albert, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Daniel P. Maguire presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel P. Maguire Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2021 |
Category09: Limited Rule 3.740 Collections - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement CASE MGNT STMT FILED BY ATTY FOR CAVALRY SPV, LLC |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECLARATRION OF NON SERVICE AS TO ALBERT ACEVEDO |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non-Service ON ALBERT ACEVEDO | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice CASE MANAGMENT STATEMENT |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | *New Filed Case (JBSIS) | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | First Paper Filed - Fee | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Re: Venue |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.