Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Contreras, Cristina, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Winston, David S, against Doe, An Individual, John, Yin Management, Inc., A California Corporation, represented by Mcclintock, Rachel L, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Maguire, Daniel P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaguire, Daniel P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 01, 2021 |
Category15: Unlimited Other Employment |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Case Management Conference
Date: July 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Case Management Conference Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Disqualification Granted JUDGE MCADAM PER CCP 170.6 |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment JUDGE MAGUIRE - AFAP |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Disqualification JUDGE MCADAM PER CCP 170.6 |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Advance Jury Fee (Non-Refundable) DEFT YIN MANAGEMENT, INC.'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Disqualification pursuant to CCP170.6 filed by FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAINST JUDGE MCADAM |
|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DENIED ON REQUEST FOR JOINT STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY ENTIRE ACTION PENDING MEDIATION, INCLUDING FORMAL DISCOVERY, RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE, AND LITIGATION, AND TO CONTINUE THE CMC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.