Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Naidu, Rabeen, Naidu, Rayani, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Harvey, Randy J, against Economy Inn, Patel, Vanita, represented by Diepenbrock & Cotter, Llp, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Maguire, Daniel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaguire, Daniel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management125 days |
Filing DateMarch 06, 2009 |
Category15: Unlimited Other Employment |
Time To Trial508 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions692 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time864 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
*Motion
Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
July 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF ENTR DISM/POM |
|
July 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: file away |
|
July 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
July 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Received FAX RECEIVED Notes: FAX TRANSMISSION RECEIVED FROM from Harvey & Wilcox a tty for plaintiff confirming req to vacate their moti on of 8-26-11 |
|
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event | LODGING OF DOCUMENTS Notes: PROP ORDER | |
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: PLACED IN FILE |
|
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Jury JURY TRIAL Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL IN SUPPORT* Notes: OF MICHAEL S WILCOX IN SUPP OF MTN TO ENFORCE SETTLMNT |
|
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MTN TO ENFORCE SETTLMNT BY PLNTFS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.