Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bohne, Elizabeth, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Bohm, Lawrance A, against Harder And Company, Community R Esearch, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Assigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management126 days |
Filing DateApril 30, 2009 |
Category15: Unlimited Other Employment |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time214 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
December 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF ENTR DISM/POM Notes: AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED 11/30/09 |
|
November 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL W/ PREJ |
|
September 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
September 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
August 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CONTINUANCE Notes: ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION THE CMC CURRENTLY SET FOR 9/3/09 IS VACATED & RESET TO 12/17/09 FOR DISMISSAL |
|
August 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Continued by Court's Motion CONT BY COURT'S MTN |
|
August 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Continuance of Hearing or Case Mgmt Conference CNT CMC NTC SETTLED Notes: CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT NTC OF SETTLEMENT FILED |
|
August 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement NTC OF SETTLEMENT Notes: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE |
|
August 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
Letter CORRECTION LTR SENT Notes: returning notice of settlement as date of settlement missing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.