Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cousins, Kristi, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Dobrin, Michael K., against Cunningham, Brian, Veare, Mary, represented by Dehart, A Jeffrey, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with White, Kathleen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWhite, Kathleen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management129 days |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
Category22: Limited Auto - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time245 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Jury
Judge: White, Kathleen M |
|
February 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference TRIAL READINESS CONF Judge: White, Kathleen M |
|
November 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Settlement Conference
Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
November 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Settlement Conference
Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
August 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
August 21, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE* Notes: OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE | |
July 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CONTINUANCE Notes: FROM 11 14 08 TO 11 20 08 9 AM PER JKO |
|
July 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Continued by Court's Motion CONT BY COURT'S MTN |
|
May 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: calendar file away |
|
May 09, 2008 | Docket Event | AMENDED* Notes: AMENDED NOTICE OF TRIAL, TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE A ND MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (filed by plaintif f) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.