Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Midland Funding, L, Lc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Zimmerman, Hallie N, against Jessiman, William C, represented by Merrill, Ann K, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Assigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management179 days |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions204 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time204 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney SUBST OF ATTORNEY Notes: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY; HALLIE N. ZIMMERMAN, ESQ. IN PLACE OF ANN K. MERRILL, ESQ. FOR THE PLAINTIFF |
|
April 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE AWAY |
|
April 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney SUBST OF ATTORNEY Notes: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY ANN K. MERRILL FOR MIDLAND F UNDING LLC IN PLACE OF MANN BRACKEN LLP |
|
January 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT ISSUED $ | |
July 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Request to Enter Default REQ TO ENTER DEFAULT Notes: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT WILLIAM C. JESSIMAN |
|
July 18, 2008 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED Notes: AS REQUESTED AGAINST WILLIAM C. JESSIMAN | |
July 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Change of Address NTC CHANGE FIRM NAME Notes: NOTICE OF NAME CHANGE OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL OF RECOR D FROM ESKANOS & ADLER PC TO MANN BRACKEN, LLC AS A R ESULT OF A MERGER EFFECTIVE AS OF JULY 1, 2008 |
|
July 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Dismissal of Does DISM OF "DOES" |
|
July 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.