Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chase Bank Usa, N., A., A Corpor Ation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Farmar, Law Group, Pc, against Martinell, Shannon, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Maguire, Daniel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaguire, Daniel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management180 days |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2007 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
Time To Trial1027 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions153 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time153 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: MATMOR |
|
December 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT FILED* |
|
November 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment ACK SATISFY JDGM Notes: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT |
|
July 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
*Opposition to Claim of Exemption OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION NO APPEARANCES MADE ON THE RECORD CLAIM OF EXEMPTION GRANTED IN PART-DEBTOR'S WAGES TO BE GARNISHED AT THE RATE OF $100.00 PER MONTH BEGINNI NG SEPTEMBER 1, 2011 AND ONGOING UNTIL DEBT IS PAID IN FULL. COURT PREPARED AND SIGNED ORDER TO BE FILED BY CLERK AND COPY FAXED TO SHERIFF DEPT TODAY. Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
July 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Claim of Exemption CLM EXMP GRANTED Notes: COURT ORDER JUDGEMENT DEBTOR'S CLAIM OF EXEMPTION IS GRANTED IN PART-DEBTOR'S WAGES SHALL BE GARNISHED AT $100.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING SEPTEMBER 1, 2011 AND ONGOING UNTIL DEBT IS PAID IN FULL. |
|
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing NTC OF HEARING Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED |
|
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Claim of Exemption NTC OPPOSE CLM EXEMP Notes: NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED. |
|
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: SACRAMENTO COUNTY $3,010.84 |
|
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO/COST/INT/CREDS Notes: $43.00 COSTS; $94.43 INTEREST |
|
November 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Abstract Issued ABST/WRIT ISSUED* Notes: ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.