Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Weisman, Donna, Weisman, Donna S., Weisman, Marc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Roscoe, William Patrick, against Creative Window Co, Ncepts, Inc., Fouts, Don, Fouts Landscape, represented by Middleton, Michael S, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Kent O'Mara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKent O'Mara Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management124 days |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2007 |
Category06: Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions343 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF ENTR DISM/POM Notes: (as to dismissal filed 12-21-09) |
|
December 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Dismissal DISM OF X-COMPL Notes: DISMISSAL OF CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY DON FOUTS DBA DON FOUTS CONSTRUCTION AND FOUTS LANDSCAPE ON 2/25/ 08. |
|
December 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF XCMPLT FILED BY DON FOUTS DBA DON FOUTS CONSTRUCTION AND FOUTS LANDSCAPE ON 2/ 25/09 (W/ PREJ) |
|
December 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED AS REQUESTED - NAME ON 1.b.(3) DOES NOT MATCH NAME ON CROSS COMPLAINT |
|
October 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF ENTR DISM/POM |
|
October 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE DISMISSAL ENTERED ON 10/5/09 AS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ONLY |
|
May 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL Notes: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE MINUTE ORDER OF 4/16/ 09 |
|
April 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Settlement Conference SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HEARD W/O COURTROOM CLERK WILLIAM ROSCO PRESENT WITH PLAINTIFF BEN BLAISDELL PRESENT FOR MEEKS/FORTE NICK IACOBITTI (TRAVELERS) PRESENT FOR MEEKS ROBERT SMITH PRESENT FOR FORTE CHRISTOPHER STEADMAN PRESENT FOR TERAQUEST REGGIE DUNN PRESENT FOR THE GARAGE DOOR CENTER KARIN LANDRY PRESENT FOR C&C MECHANICAL BOB PAIGE PRESENT FOR C&C MECHANICAL KENNETH SLOAN PRESENT FOR C&C MECHANICAL RAMSEY KUBEIN PRESENT FOR FERG'S ELECTRIC, FORTE TILE, DEATHARIDGE CONSTRUCTION THE CASE, INCLUDING ALL CROSS ACTIONS, IS SETTLED. THE TRIAL DATE AND THE TRIAL READINESS DATES ARE ORDERED VACATED. THE PARTIES HAVE SIGNED A STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT (CCP SECTION 664.6) WHICH IS ATTACHED HERETO AND IS ENFORCEABLE AS PROVIDED IN SECTION 664.6. Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
April 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: J K O'MARA W/FILE LETTER RECEIVED 4/15/09 FROM LORI KIDD |
|
April 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: adr clerk |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.