Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Roberts, Robert, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Christison, Robert A, against Goodyear Tire And, Rubber Compa Ny, Wingfoot Commercia, L Tires, represented by Yoka & Smith, Llp., in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Kent O'Mara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKent O'Mara Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management129 days |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
Category23: Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Time To Trial536 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time815 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Bail Reversal BAIL REVSL -GENERAL Notes: BAIL REVERSAL JURY NOT USED |
|
April 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
April 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF ENTR DISM/POM |
|
March 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
March 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Continuance of Hearing or Case Mgmt Conference CNT CMC NTC SETTLED Notes: CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT NTC OF SETTLEMENT FILED re: dismissal |
|
February 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Jury JURY TRIAL Judge: White, Kathleen M |
|
February 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: file away (in my outlook for 3/17/09) |
|
February 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement NTC OF SETTLEMENT Notes: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 877.6(A)(2) |
|
January 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference TRIAL READINESS CONF ATTY ALLEN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF ATTY WALTER YOKA, ATTY RIC LABERDIE FOR DEF'S JURY TRIAL IS CONFIRMED Judge: Gaard, Janet N |
|
January 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Advance Jury Fee (Non-Refundable) JURY FEE DEPOSIT Notes: POSTED BY YOKA & SMITH, LLP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.