Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Morris, Joshawa Nathan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Connolly, Thomas P, against Blazona Concrete C, Onstruction, Inc., Garcia Ramirez, Adrian A., represented by Katchis, Harris & Yempuku, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Assigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management122 days |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
Category22: Unlimited Auto |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time378 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF ENTR DISM/POM |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE |
|
August 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Motion MOTION TO COMPEL T CONNOLLY, III PRES FOR PLTF C PFEIFER PRES FOR DEF ATTORNEY'S STIPULATE TO VACATE THE TENTATIVE RULING A ND DROP THE MOTION FROM CALENDAR. Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
August 07, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE* Notes: NOTICE OF NON OPPO TO DEF. BLAZONA CONSTRUCTION, INC. MTN TO COMPEL | |
July 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: OF CHAD H. PFEIFER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR AWARD OF MONETARY SANCTION. ATTY FOR DEFENDANTS |
|
July 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities MEMO OF P & A Notes: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FOR AWARD OF MONETARY SANCTION (CCP 2031.300 AND 2023.030 (A)) |
|
July 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: CALENDAR FILE AWAY BIN |
|
July 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAILING* Notes: TO THOMAS P. CONNOLLY, ESQ. 7/23/07 WITH COPYS OF NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FOR AWARD OF MONETARY SANCTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL; DECLARATION OF CHAD H. PFEIFER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR AWARD OF MONETARY SANCTION; PORPOSED ORDER. |
|
July 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Motion MOTION* Notes: COMPELLING RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FOR AWARD OF MONETARY SANCTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL; DECLARATION OF CHAD H. PFEIFER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL; DECLARATION OF CHAD H. PFEIFER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR AWARD OF MONETARY SANCTION (CCP 2031.300 AND 2023.030(A)); AND PROPOSED ORDER. |
|
June 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE AWAY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.