Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Portfolio Recovery, Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gordon, Amy L, against Britt, Jacquelin, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Assigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management123 days |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2006 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time244 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: CMC BOX |
|
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement CASE MGMT STATEMENT Notes: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLTFF |
|
August 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court COURT TRIAL HELD REFEREE DAVID W REED CLERK: MLEON PLTF NOT PRESENT WITH/BY ATTORNEY: LYLE D SOLOMON DEFENDANT PRESENT WITH/BY ATTORNEY: ERIC FAGAN PLAINTIFF COU REQUEST FRO CONTINUANCE-DENIED DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
July 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: august bin |
|
July 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement CASE MGMT STATEMENT Notes: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Filed by plaintiff) |
|
April 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference CASE MANGEMENT CONFERENCE WITH/BY ATTORNEY: MOGLEN DEFT PRESENT CONTINUED TO/FOR: 8-22-07 COURT TRIAL D-12 0830AM Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
March 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement CASE MGMT STATEMENT Notes: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFT JACQUELINE BRITT |
|
March 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: DMB BOX |
|
March 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement CASE MGMT STATEMENT Notes: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLTFF |
|
March 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: DMB APRIL FILING BOX |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.