Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Shea, Dan, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Hogan, Thomas M, against Smith, Linda, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Assigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2006 |
Category32: Limited Residential Unlawful Detainer - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Unlawful Detainer 60-Day Confidentiality Surpassed RESTORE CONF CASE Notes: RESTORE CONFIDENTIAL CASE |
|
March 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT WHOLLY SATISFD Notes: WRIT WHOLLY SATISFIED AS TO POSSESSION ONLY |
|
March 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: GAIL/FILE AWAY |
|
January 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: YOLO COUNTY FOR POSSESSION ONLY STAYED UNTIL 2/15/07 |
|
January 29, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: ORDER PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES - UD | |
January 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ATTY THOMAS HOGAN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF; DEFENDANT LINDA SMITH PRESENT; COURT ACK NOTICE ISSUED BY POLIC E DEPT RENTAL NOT UP TO CODE; WIT CALLED BY PLT S&T: BABE MOONEY - MANAGEMENT AGENT; WIT CALLED BY DEF S&T LOURA MEDERIOS; PATRICIA STOWE; LINDA K. SMITH-DEF COURT LISTENED TO ARGUMENTS, ALLOWED PARTIES TO TALK AFTER HEARING AND REACH A STIPULATION; PARTIES RETURN ED WITH STIP IN HAND, COURT EXECUTED STIPULATION. Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
January 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CONTINUANCE |
|
January 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
January 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Continued by Court's Motion CONT BY COURT'S MTN |
|
January 03, 2007 | Docket Event | AMENDED* Notes: AMENDED ANSWER BY LINDA K SMITH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.