Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Whittle & Associat, Es Property Management, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Ford, Harold L, against Tuter, Jerry L., in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Beronio, Janene presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeronio, Janene Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2005 |
Category32: Limited Residential Unlawful Detainer - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time34 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT WHOLLY SATISFD Notes: WRIT WHOLLY SATISFIED AS TO POSESSION ONLY |
|
February 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AND NOTICE OF HEARING AND ORDER AFTER HEARING |
|
February 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Other Hearing HEARING ON CLAIM OF POSSESSION ATTY FORD APPEARED PRESENTED ORDER TO COURT, COURT EXECUTED ORDER Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
February 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Other Hearing BY ALEJANDRO JAMES LEON FOR CLAIM OF POSSESSION Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
February 02, 2006 | Docket Event | FILED* Notes: CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AND NOTICE OF HEARING FROM ALEJANDRO JAMES LEON | |
January 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court COMMISSIONER BERONIO CLERKS MEADOWS/QUINTANA PLTFF APPEARING W/ATTY HAROLD FORD DEFENDANT APPEARING WITNESS SWORN PLTFF SWORN & TESTIFIED - MAYLAND WHITTLE DEF SWORN & TESTIFIED Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
January 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE AWAY |
|
January 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Abstract Issued ABST/WRIT ISSUED* Notes: WRIT OF POSSESSION REAL PROPERTY YOLO COUNTY SHERIFF |
|
January 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL Notes: NOTICE OF UD TRIAL |
|
January 04, 2006 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE Notes: SERVED: ALL TENANTS IN POSSESSION WITH SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION BY SERVING RALPH SOUZA AND POSTED ON PREMISES ON 12-27-05; MAILED ON 12-27-05 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.