Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Camelback Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Mehigan, Richard M, against Providence, Dawnesha M, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Beronio, Janene presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeronio, Janene Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2005 |
Category32: Limited Residential Unlawful Detainer - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time28 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT WHOLLY SATISFD Notes: WRIT WHOLLY SATISFIED AS TO POSESSION ONLY |
|
February 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE |
|
January 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: WRIT ISSUED - YOLO COUNTY |
|
January 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court PRO-TEM RICHARD LANSBURGH CLERK QUINTANA PLTFF APPEARING W/ATTY RICHARD MEHIGAN DEF APPEARING WITNESS SWORN PLTFF SWORN & TESTIFIED DEF SWORN & TESTIFIED Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
January 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS FILED |
|
January 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: COMPLAINT; PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESION, INFORMTIONAL FLIER TO DAWNESHA M. PROVIDENCE ON 12/26/05 BY ERIC J. MEYER |
|
January 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: CUSTOMER COPIES SENT TO PUBLIC BIN ROOM 103 |
|
January 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
At-Issue Memorandum AT ISSUE MEMO - UD |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited ANSWER Notes: OF DAWNESHA PROVIDENCE |
|
December 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of UD Action NTC UD ACTION Notes: 02-20-06 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.