Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Food 4 Less, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Stassinos, Paul, against Munoz, Jose, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Fall, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFall, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management264 days |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2004 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions70 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time71 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE AWAY |
|
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT WHOLLY SATISFD Notes: WRIT WHOLLY SATISFIED |
|
September 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
August 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment ACK SATISFY JDGM Notes: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT IN FULL FILED BY ATTN FOR PLAINTIFF: FOOD 4 LESS |
|
August 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: CT FILE |
|
April 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: YOLO CO. $859.06 |
|
March 09, 2005 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED Notes: JOSE MUNOZ | |
March 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS - SUBSERVICE* Notes: JOSE MUNOZ/IBETH MUNOZ, SISTER 1-17-05 - MAILED 1-17-05 - SUMMONS, COMPLAINT |
|
March 09, 2005 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT* Notes: AFFIDAVIT RE: COMPLIANCE WITH CC 1719 | |
March 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.