Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Palisades Collecti, On, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bleier, Elizabeth A, against Castro, Maria A, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Fall, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFall, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management265 days |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2004 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions57 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time63 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT WHOLLY UNSATSFD Notes: WRIT FILED WHOLLY UNSATISIFIED |
|
November 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: MCCLELLAN |
|
June 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: mcclellan |
|
June 29, 2009 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: rec'd Final Return to Court Writ of Execution (no wri t attached) no $ rec'd | |
September 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
March 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: SACRAMENTO COUNTY |
|
March 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO/COST/INT/CREDS Notes: $6.19 ACCRUED INTEREST |
|
March 16, 2005 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT ISSUED $ Notes: ABSTRACT ISSUED $1,501.89 | |
February 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: OF PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
February 23, 2005 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED Notes: ENTERED AS REQUESTED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.