Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garden Acres Mobil, E Home Park Limited Part, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Byers, David W, against Ruiz, Amado, Ruiz, Dora, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Beronio, Janene presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeronio, Janene Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2004 |
Category32: Limited Residential Unlawful Detainer - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions50 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time66 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT FILED* Notes: SATISFIED |
|
March 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: YOLO CO. |
|
February 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL CAROL KHAN PRESENT W/ATTY BYERS DEF/MINOR PRESENT WITNESSES S&T FOR PLAINTIFF - CAROL KHAN FOR DEF - DORA RUIZ WRIT TO ISSUE IMMEDIATELY Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
February 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
At-Issue Memorandum AT ISSUE MEMO - UD |
|
February 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Request to Enter Default REQ TO ENTER DEFAULT Notes: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT |
|
February 09, 2005 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED Notes: AMADO RUIZ | |
January 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS - SUBSERVICE* Notes: AMADO RUIZ/OCCUPANT - DORA RUIZ 12-29-04 - MAILED 12-29-04 - SUMMONS, COMPLAINT |
|
January 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS FILED |
|
January 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: 12-29-04 - DORA RUIZ SUMMONS, COMPLAINT |
|
December 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited ANSWER Notes: DORA RUIZ ANSWERS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.