Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nationwide Credit, Services, filed a(n) 42: Limited Other Complaint (Not Spec) - 10,000 -25,000 case represented by Felton, James R, against Amolo, Chris, Amolo, Diane, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Fall, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFall, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management270 days |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2004 |
Category42: Limited Other Complaint (Not Spec) - 10,000 -25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions139 days |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time141 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT WHOLLY UNSATSFD Notes: WRIT FILED WHOLLY UNSATISIFIED SACRAMENTO COUNTY |
|
August 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: SACRAMENTO, $27,967.42 |
|
August 17, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT* Notes: OF JAMES R. FELTON RE INTEREST AFTER JUDGMENT | |
August 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO/COST/INT/CREDS Notes: $55.00 COSTS, $11,757.20 INTEREST |
|
July 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents RETURNED DOCUMENTS Notes: RETURNED DOCUMENTS: WRIT- MISSING MEMO OF COST; DECLARATION OF INTEREST (MANDATORY JUDICIAL COUNCIL FORM REQUIRED) |
|
July 02, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT* Notes: AFFIDAVIT OF JAMES R. FELTON RE INTEREST AFTER JUDGMENT | |
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT WHOLLY UNSATSFD Notes: WRIT FILED WHOLLY UNSATISIFIED RETURN ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SACRAMENTO COUNTY |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: MATMOR FILE AWAY |
|
December 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: WRIT OF EXECUTION (Money Judgment) SACRAMENTO COUNTY SHERIFF $26,820.68 |
|
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT* Notes: OF JAMES R FELTON RE INTEREST AFTER JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.