Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yolo County Collec, Tions, Zurcher, Gary Walter, Jessee, Virginia Mae, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lauricella, John E, against Hensley, Michelle L, Hensley, Chuck R, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWarriner, Thomas E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 1987 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2006 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Conversion Notes ADD FIXED CASE Notes: ADD FIXED CASE - BEGIN JBSIS STATS |
|
May 12, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER* | |
May 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss
Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
March 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned RETURNED MAIL Notes: Letter sent to CHUCH & MICHELLE HENSLEY returned - ATTEMPTED, NOT KNOWN |
|
March 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
March 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Motion MTN DISM-LACK PROSEC |
|
December 29, 1987 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed COMPL - MUNI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.